U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-50090
  • Case Name: Bud Marty May
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
October, 2020
  • October 09, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 07, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
September, 2020
  • September 23, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reopen Case (Text Order)]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 22, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reopen Case (fee required)]
  • September 21, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Case Closed Without a Discharge]
  • September 21, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
  • July 03, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • June 30, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
May, 2020
  • May 12, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
  • April 18, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 16, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Interim Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • April 16, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Interim Rpt and Applications for Compensation]
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • April 08, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Adversary Case]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request to Receive Electronic Notice]
April, 2019
  • April 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
December, 2018
  • December 30, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 28, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • December 21, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • December 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Transcript (First Meeting of Creditors)]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 10, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Complaint]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Transcript (Depositions and 2004 Exams Only)]
  • July 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Examination 2004]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Examination (2004)]
  • June 19, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Debtor to File Tax Information]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • April 18, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Employee Income Records]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
  • April 17, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.