U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50036-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Poor Bear-White Plume
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • June 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sentencing]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 28, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 28, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 24, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 02, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 12, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 12, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
November, 2018
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 02, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 02, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • October 26, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 26, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 26, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 25, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 07, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • August 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2018: [Consent]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • June 06, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 06, 2018: [Response]
  • June 05, 2018: [Furlough]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 16, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 16, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 04, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Request]
  • April 23, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 23, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • April 20, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 20, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 20, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 19, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.