U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40188
  • Case Name: Jennifer Mae McLaughlin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
May, 2018
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • May 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.