U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diaz-Virula
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 03, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 03, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 29, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 29, 2018: [Waiver]
  • June 29, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 29, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 26, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 26, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 14, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 04, 2018: [Discovery]
April, 2018
  • April 27, 2018: [Response]
  • April 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 27, 2018: [Request]
  • April 26, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • April 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • April 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • April 24, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • April 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 24, 2018: [Arrest]
  • April 24, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.