U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 20, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 19, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 14, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 25, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • July 25, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 25, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 25, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • July 25, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 25, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 24, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.