U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40198
  • Case Name: Jamie Lea Scofield
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
  • August 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
July, 2018
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approving/Denying Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
April, 2018
  • April 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Appointment Rejection]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Add Trustee]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Employee Income Records]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Pierce, Lee Ann [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.