U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10042
  • Case Name: James Moses Jones
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 17, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
May, 2019
  • May 14, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • April 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • April 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.