U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10044
  • Case Name: James Todd Campbell and Laura Lynn Campbell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 24, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
December, 2018
  • December 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 27, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • November 28, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • July 22, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
  • May 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • May 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • May 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.