U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40219
  • Case Name: Delwin Leslie Johnson and Kari Jo Johnson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Carlson, Kyle L. [Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
December, 2018
  • December 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • November 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • November 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • November 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • July 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • June 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • June 12, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 05, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.