U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marquez-Ortiz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 17, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 11, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 03, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 03, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 03, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 12, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 23, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 17, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 17, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • May 15, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 11, 2018: [Response]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 09, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 09, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 09, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 09, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 09, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 08, 2018: [Request]
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 08, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 08, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 08, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 08, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.