U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40227
  • Case Name: Kevin Julian Winter
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Claim Satisfaction]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
  • May 27, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (new)]
  • May 12, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 01, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • April 29, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (text order)]
  • April 16, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 09, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
  • March 11, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (text order)]
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
February, 2021
  • February 17, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
February, 2020
  • February 11, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Returned Mail]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 31, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment of Mailing List with Notice]
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Striking Document]
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • December 16, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • December 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • November 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transcript (Hearing or Trial)]
  • September 28, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Transcript]
  • September 26, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Claim]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 06, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
June, 2019
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Adversary Case]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Answer to Complaint]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Complaint]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Filing Proof of Claim]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 14, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • June 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Corrective Entry]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismissing Corporate Joint Debtor]
  • May 09, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.