U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Soto
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [USCA Judgment]
  • January 24, 2023: [USCA Opinion]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • May 11, 2022: [Supplement]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 31, 2022: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
  • March 08, 2022: [Supplemental Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • March 07, 2022: [Transcript]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • October 19, 2021: [Transcript]
  • October 13, 2021: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • October 13, 2021: [Transcript - Public]
  • October 13, 2021: [Transcript]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 17, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • September 16, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • September 08, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • September 08, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • September 07, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 07, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • September 05, 2021: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • September 05, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 02, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • September 01, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 04, 2021: [Letter]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 01, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 09, 2021: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • June 07, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2021: [Transcript]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Acquittal]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • May 07, 2021: [Extend]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Acquittal]
  • April 19, 2021: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • April 19, 2021: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • April 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 16, 2021: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
  • April 16, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • April 16, 2021: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • April 16, 2021: [Verdict]
  • April 16, 2021: [Response to Jury Question]
  • April 16, 2021: [Jury Question]
  • April 16, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 16, 2021: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • April 13, 2021: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • April 13, 2021: [Jury Instructions]
  • April 13, 2021: [Jury List]
  • April 13, 2021: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • April 05, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • March 30, 2021: [Reply to Motion Response]
  • March 30, 2021: [Extend]
  • March 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice of Expert Witness]
  • March 16, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • March 15, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [Text Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • March 09, 2021: [Request]
  • March 08, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
February, 2021
  • February 22, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions (attorney use)]
  • February 19, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Brief]
November, 2020
  • November 12, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 11, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 03, 2020: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 03, 2020: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 02, 2020: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 02, 2020: [Notice]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 21, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 20, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • October 16, 2020: [Objection]
  • October 16, 2020: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 16, 2020: [In Limine]
  • October 16, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2020: [Response to Motion]
  • October 16, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 14, 2020: [Notice]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • August 09, 2020: [Withdraw Document]
  • August 06, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • August 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 01, 2020: [Status Conference]
May, 2020
  • May 30, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 06, 2020: [Order Reassigning Case & Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 06, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 02, 2020: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • January 02, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 30, 2019: [Response]
  • December 16, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • December 16, 2019: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum]
  • December 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 11, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 10, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • December 04, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 22, 2019: [Sealed Order]
  • November 20, 2019: [Notice]
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice]
  • November 18, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 15, 2019: [Notice]
  • November 15, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 15, 2019: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 15, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order]
  • November 14, 2019: [Order]
  • November 12, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 12, 2019: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 08, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 08, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 08, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2019: [Notice]
  • November 04, 2019: [Notice]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 23, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • October 11, 2019: [Transcript]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 18, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2019
  • May 23, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 10, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 17, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • April 16, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • February 21, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
January, 2019
  • January 14, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 11, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 11, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 04, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 04, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 02, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 20, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 11, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 09, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 08, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • May 08, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 08, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.