U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Schmidt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 06, 2019: [Sentencing]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 28, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 28, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 01, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2019
  • April 29, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 01, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 01, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 20, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 20, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 16, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: [Consent]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 01, 2018: [Discovery]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 25, 2018: [Response]
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 23, 2018: [Request]
  • May 22, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 21, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 21, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 21, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 15, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.