U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Osorio-Gutierrez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 24, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 31, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 31, 2018: [Waiver]
  • May 31, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice]
  • May 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 22, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • May 22, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 09, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 09, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.