U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40071-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sebastian-Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 29, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 29, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 29, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 28, 2018: [Consent]
  • June 28, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 28, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 26, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 26, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice]
  • June 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 13, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 12, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 17, 2018: [Discovery]
  • May 09, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.