U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40070-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Patterson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Receipt for Return of Physical Exhibits]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Judgment - Amended]
  • February 08, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 07, 2019: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • February 07, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 06, 2019: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • February 06, 2019: [Verdict]
  • February 06, 2019: [Response to Jury Question]
  • February 06, 2019: [Jury Question]
  • February 06, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 06, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 06, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2019: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • February 06, 2019: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • February 05, 2019: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 05, 2019: [Jury List]
  • February 04, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • February 04, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • February 04, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • February 04, 2019: [Notice]
  • February 04, 2019: [In Limine]
  • February 04, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • February 03, 2019: [In Limine]
  • February 03, 2019: [Notice]
January, 2019
  • January 29, 2019: [In Limine]
  • January 29, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • January 23, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 14, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 02, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 20, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 13, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Response]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 23, 2018: [Discovery]
  • May 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 18, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 18, 2018: [Request]
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 16, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 10, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.