U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lea
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 25, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 25, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 17, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 10, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 05, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 05, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 04, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 30, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 30, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 28, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 26, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 19, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 02, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 10, 2018: [Extend]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 23, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 13, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 10, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 10, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 10, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 25, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 25, 2018: [Discovery]
  • May 24, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • May 24, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 24, 2018: [Extend]
  • May 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 18, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 17, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 15, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 10, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.