U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Morente-Cahuec
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 30, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 19, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 19, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 30, 2018: [Discovery]
  • May 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 18, 2018: [Response]
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2018: [Request]
  • May 10, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 10, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 10, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 09, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.