U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scheurenbrand
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2019
  • May 10, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • April 05, 2019: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
September, 2018
  • September 25, 2018: [Order]
  • September 25, 2018: [Stipulation to Exclude Period of Delay]
  • September 25, 2018: [Statement of Facts in Support of Pretrial Diversion]
  • September 25, 2018: [Agreement for Pretrial Diversion]
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 12, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 12, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 18, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 18, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 18, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.