U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Denoyer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
December, 2024
  • December 11, 2024: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 30, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • November 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 17, 2022: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • November 17, 2022: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • November 17, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 14, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 10, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 07, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 02, 2022: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 26, 2022: [Furlough]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 24, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 18, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 20, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 19, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 19, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 19, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 19, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 07, 2022: [Terminate Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 26, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 23, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 17, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 17, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 17, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 17, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 17, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 16, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 29, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 29, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 10, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 31, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 31, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 02, 2018: [Consent]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 01, 2018: [Discovery]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2018: [Request]
  • May 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 15, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 14, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.