U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kempf
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 07, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 22, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 22, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 22, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 22, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 22, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 22, 2022: [Order of Detention]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 09, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • March 09, 2021: [Stipulation]
October, 2020
  • October 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • October 06, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • October 06, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • March 12, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2019
  • April 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 05, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 01, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 29, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 29, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 04, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 17, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 17, 2019: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 17, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • January 16, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 11, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 10, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 10, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 09, 2019: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • September 03, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 03, 2018: [Transcript]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 29, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • August 29, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • August 23, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • August 16, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 16, 2018: [Suppress]
  • August 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 14, 2018: [Extend]
  • August 07, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 14, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 14, 2018: [Discovery]
  • June 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 30, 2018: [Request]
  • May 25, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 24, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 24, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 24, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.