U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hofer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 16, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 04, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 28, 2018: [Extend]
  • December 28, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 27, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • December 27, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 27, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 18, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 18, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 18, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Consent]
  • October 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 22, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 18, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 17, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 17, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 17, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 07, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 18, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • May 18, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 18, 2018: [Response]
  • May 17, 2018: [Discovery]
  • May 17, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 16, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 15, 2018: [Request]
  • May 11, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 10, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 09, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 09, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 09, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 09, 2018: [Warrant Issued]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 09, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 09, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.