U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Monette
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
  • February 01, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 01, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 01, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
January, 2019
  • January 24, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 24, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 24, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 17, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
December, 2018
  • December 27, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 07, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
September, 2018
  • September 11, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 05, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 30, 2018: [Discovery]
  • July 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 03, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 18, 2018: [Response]
  • May 17, 2018: [Request]
  • May 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 11, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 11, 2018: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • May 10, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 10, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 10, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 10, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 10, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 10, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 10, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 10, 2018: [Arrest]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.