U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Leubner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 11, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 10, 2018: [Extend]
  • September 06, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 06, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 01, 2018: [Discovery]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Response]
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2018: [Request]
  • May 18, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 18, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 17, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 15, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 14, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 11, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 10, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.