U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-10050
  • Case Name: John Robert Shine and Cynthia Louise Shine
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 30, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
  • August 08, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (text entry only)]
  • August 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 17, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Request for Certified Copy]
May, 2022
  • May 01, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 06, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 04, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • April 02, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 22, 2022: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2019
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver) (fee required)]
October, 2018
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver) (fee required)]
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • July 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • June 20, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • June 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • June 07, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • June 05, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 14, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • May 13, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 11, 2018: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.