U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Philemonof
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Order]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • December 15, 2020: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • December 14, 2020: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 19, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • August 19, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 19, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 05, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
July, 2020
  • July 13, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 26, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • May 21, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 08, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • May 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 07, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 07, 2020: [Consent]
  • May 07, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • May 07, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 07, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 01, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
January, 2019
  • January 17, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • November 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 19, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 14, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 13, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 10, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 10, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 17, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 03, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 27, 2018: [Consent]
  • July 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 11, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 11, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 11, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 01, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Request]
  • May 31, 2018: [Consent]
  • May 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • May 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 21, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 16, 2018: [Request]
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 15, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 14, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 14, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 14, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 14, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.