U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eagle Thunder
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • October 08, 2024: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 08, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 08, 2024: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 08, 2024: [Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 03, 2024: [Add and Terminate Judges]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 05, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 03, 2023: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 30, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 30, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 30, 2022: [Waiver]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 02, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 27, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 26, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • September 03, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 03, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 03, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • September 03, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 03, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 02, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2018
  • November 13, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 13, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 08, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 01, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 01, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 31, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 31, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 29, 2018: [Consent]
  • June 29, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 19, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 19, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 16, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 16, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 16, 2018: [Request]
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 16, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 16, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 16, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 16, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 16, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 16, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 14, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.