U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
October, 2019
  • October 04, 2019: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 17, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 03, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2019
  • June 10, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 10, 2019: [Passport - Return of]
  • June 07, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 07, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • June 07, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • June 06, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 03, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 31, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 31, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 29, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 29, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 29, 2019: [Evaluation]
  • May 23, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 09, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • May 09, 2019: [Seal Existing Document]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 19, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • January 04, 2019: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 04, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 04, 2019: [Consent]
  • January 04, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 04, 2018: [Response to Motion]
November, 2018
  • November 26, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 19, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 16, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 16, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 16, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 20, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 20, 2018: [Discovery]
  • June 11, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 11, 2018: [Request]
  • June 11, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 08, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 08, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2018: [Passport - Receipt of]
  • June 08, 2018: [Bail Report]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 15, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 15, 2018: [Summons Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.