U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-40244
  • Case Name: Rex Calvin Flint
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
  • January 05, 2023: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 28, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Substitute Attorney]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 18, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 19, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Proof of Claim]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Claim]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 02, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
February, 2021
  • February 04, 2021: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
July, 2020
  • July 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 08, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
June, 2020
  • June 28, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 26, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
  • June 09, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • June 04, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 02, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Order]
  • June 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Affidavit of Default]
  • June 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 16, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 14, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • April 15, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • April 10, 2020: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Abandonment, Compel and Relief From Automatic Stay (fee required)]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 07, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • May 05, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 03, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver) (fee required)]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • April 10, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Corrective Entry]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation of Plan]
  • March 12, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
February, 2019
  • February 11, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • February 08, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 30, 2019: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
December, 2018
  • December 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • December 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
October, 2018
  • October 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Exhibits Destroyed]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • September 06, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Supplement Schedule I and/or J]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Ch 12/13)]
  • August 13, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • May 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 24, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Court's Exhibit and Witness List]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Withdrawal of Claim (Text Entry)]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • May 20, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • May 18, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • May 16, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Use Cash Collateral]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.