U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 13-40110
  • Case Name: Valerie Jean DeSchepper
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge (Ch 11/13)]
  • May 17, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 15, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.