U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brushbreaker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 06, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 03, 2022: [Extend]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • December 17, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 17, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 03, 2021: [Furlough]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 30, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Text Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 23, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • August 06, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 04, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • August 04, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • July 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 23, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • July 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • April 29, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • April 19, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 18, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 18, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 18, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 21, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2019
  • February 07, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 06, 2019: [Waiver of Indictment]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 25, 2019: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • January 25, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 25, 2019: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 25, 2019: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 25, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 09, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 08, 2019: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 04, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 18, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 18, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 15, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 19, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2018: [Order]
  • June 08, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 07, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 06, 2018: [Request]
  • June 06, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 06, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 06, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • June 06, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 05, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 05, 2018: [Arrest]
  • June 05, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 05, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 05, 2018: [Request]
  • June 05, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 05, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 04, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 04, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • May 16, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 16, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.