U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Black Spotted Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 19, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 12, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 12, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2020
  • October 05, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 29, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 23, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 23, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • September 23, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 23, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 23, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 22, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
August, 2018
  • August 08, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 08, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 07, 2018: [Sentencing]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 31, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 31, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 23, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 18, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 17, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 12, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order]
  • May 25, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 24, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 24, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 23, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 23, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 22, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 21, 2018: [Request]
  • May 18, 2018: [Request]
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 16, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.