U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Makes Room For Them
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 24, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 05, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 05, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 27, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 02, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 11, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 17, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • October 10, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • October 10, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 10, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 04, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 30, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 30, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 30, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
September, 2018
  • September 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 05, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 04, 2018: [Sentencing]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 17, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 14, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 08, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 06, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 14, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 07, 2018: [Order]
  • June 06, 2018: [Stipulation]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [Request]
  • May 25, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 24, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 24, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 24, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 23, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
  • May 23, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 23, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 21, 2018: [Request]
  • May 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 16, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.