U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. One Star
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 03, 2025: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 03, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 17, 2025: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • March 17, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Revocation]
  • March 17, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 17, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • March 12, 2025: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • March 12, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 10, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 10, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 30, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 30, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 30, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 19, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 10, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 09, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 09, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 09, 2020: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 09, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
  • January 09, 2020: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • January 09, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • January 09, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 08, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 08, 2020: [Invocation of Rights]
  • January 07, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 07, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
July, 2018
  • July 25, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 25, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 25, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 25, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • July 23, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 23, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 23, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 16, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 19, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • June 19, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 19, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 25, 2018: [Order]
  • May 24, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 24, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 23, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 23, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 21, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 18, 2018: [Request]
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2018: [Request]
  • May 16, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 16, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.