U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allen et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 14, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2018
  • October 15, 2018: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • October 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 09, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Memorandum Letter]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 15, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • August 14, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 14, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 14, 2018: [Bill of Particulars]
  • August 14, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 14, 2018: [Dismiss Count]
  • August 10, 2018: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order]
  • August 07, 2018: [Stipulation]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Order]
  • July 31, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 17, 2018: [Receipt for CJA Repayment]
  • July 16, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 09, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
  • July 09, 2018: [Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 09, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • July 02, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 25, 2018: [Response]
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 25, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 25, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 25, 2018: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 25, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 19, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 19, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 19, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release (RESTRICTED)]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order for Repayment of CJA Fees]
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 19, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 19, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 19, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 19, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 19, 2018: [Arrest]
  • June 18, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 18, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 18, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 18, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 18, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 15, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2018: [Arrest]
  • June 15, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 15, 2018: [Request]
  • June 15, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 15, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 15, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 16, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.