U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30064-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Red Elk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice of Unrestricting Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 28, 2020: [Restricted Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • July 27, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • July 27, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 27, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 21, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 21, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 14, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • July 06, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 02, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 19, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • May 19, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 05, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 05, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • April 01, 2020: [Oral Motion for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 01, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 01, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • March 16, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 13, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 13, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 13, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 13, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 13, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 13, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
September, 2018
  • September 06, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 06, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 05, 2018: [Sentencing]
August, 2018
  • August 29, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 23, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 23, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 09, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 27, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 19, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 19, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 19, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 19, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • May 25, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 24, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 24, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 24, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 24, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 23, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 23, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 22, 2018: [Request]
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 18, 2018: [Request]
  • May 17, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 16, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.