U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:98-cr-30052-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Provancial, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 12, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 12, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 05, 2021: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 03, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Extend]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 20, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 01, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 01, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 28, 2021: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 06, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 06, 2021: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 01, 2021: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 01, 2021: [Continue]
December, 2020
  • December 08, 2020: [Request]
  • December 03, 2020: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 25, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 24, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing]
  • November 24, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Detention Hearing (FOR COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 24, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 24, 2020: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • November 23, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 23, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • November 23, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 23, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 23, 2020: [Request]
  • November 23, 2020: [Bail Report]
  • November 20, 2020: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 20, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 10, 2020: [Indictment]
October, 2019
  • October 22, 2019: [Detainer Lodged]
May, 2018
  • May 16, 2018: [Oral Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.