U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cuny
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2018
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 23, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 17, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 29, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 25, 2018: [Discovery]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 21, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 18, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 18, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 18, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 18, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 18, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 18, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 17, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.