U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kebaso
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • July 22, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
September, 2020
  • September 01, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • August 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 26, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 24, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 24, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 24, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 24, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 14, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 05, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • August 03, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 08, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 08, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 08, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • May 19, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 28, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2020
  • March 13, 2020: [Order]
  • March 12, 2020: [Response]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 18, 2020: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 18, 2020: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 04, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
January, 2020
  • January 15, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 27, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 26, 2019: [Continue]
  • December 23, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 20, 2019: [Extend]
  • December 20, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 18, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • December 18, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • December 09, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 26, 2019: [Notice]
  • November 26, 2019: [In Limine]
  • November 26, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • November 15, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 15, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 15, 2019: [Extend]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 19, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 18, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 17, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 17, 2019: [In Limine]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 17, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • June 17, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 17, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • June 17, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 12, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 12, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 12, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 11, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 20, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 20, 2019: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 20, 2019: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 17, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 03, 2019: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 02, 2019: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 02, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 25, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 27, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 20, 2018: [Consent]
October, 2018
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 21, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 06, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Response]
  • May 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 23, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • May 23, 2018: [Discovery]
  • May 21, 2018: [Request]
  • May 21, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 21, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 18, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 17, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 17, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 17, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 17, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2018: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.