U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-40061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Crandall
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 03, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 22, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 14, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • January 14, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 07, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 07, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 04, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 04, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2018
  • December 19, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 18, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 04, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 18, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 11, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 11, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 04, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 09, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • June 08, 2018: [Discovery]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • May 23, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • May 23, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 23, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 23, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 23, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 23, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 23, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 18, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 17, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 17, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 17, 2018: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • May 17, 2018: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.