U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-30028
  • Case Name: Francis Erwin Siedschlag and Cheyenne Marcene Siedschlag
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 19, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
  • July 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
June, 2018
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • June 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • June 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Fee Due (Create Outstanding Fee)]
  • June 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • May 31, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice]
  • May 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • May 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.