U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 07, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • July 27, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 27, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 09, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • July 08, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 09, 2020: [Terminate Hearings]
  • June 09, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • June 08, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 03, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 03, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 03, 2020: [Information - Pursuant to 21 U.S.C. 851]
  • June 03, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 03, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
February, 2020
  • February 26, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 26, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 18, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 11, 2020: [Furlough]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 06, 2020: [Furlough]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Furlough]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 21, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 21, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 21, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 21, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • August 30, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • August 02, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • August 02, 2019: [Sentencing]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Evaluation]
May, 2019
  • May 09, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 03, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 03, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2019: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum - SEALED DOCKET ENTRY]
  • May 03, 2019: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2019
  • February 05, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • February 05, 2019: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2019
  • January 28, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • January 28, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
December, 2018
  • December 13, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 30, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 30, 2018: [Consent]
  • November 16, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • November 16, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 16, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 16, 2018: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 16, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
October, 2018
  • October 12, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 24, 2018: [Reconsideration]
  • July 19, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 12, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 05, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 27, 2018: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • June 27, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 15, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 30, 2018: [Notice]
  • May 29, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 29, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 29, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 29, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 29, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 29, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 29, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 29, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 29, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 25, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 23, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • May 23, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 23, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.