U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cr-10014-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Folson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 07, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • May 06, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 06, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • April 23, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 19, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 25, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 15, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2020
  • January 02, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 19, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 02, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 26, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 26, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 26, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • November 25, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 18, 2019: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • November 18, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 15, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • January 04, 2019: [Transcript - Public]
  • January 04, 2019: [Transcript - Restricted]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 17, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
September, 2018
  • September 28, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 28, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 28, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2018: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • August 29, 2018: [Invocation of Rights]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 16, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • July 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 09, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • July 09, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 09, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 09, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Order]
  • June 20, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 12, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 12, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • June 06, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 05, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 04, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 04, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2018: [Request]
  • June 01, 2018: [Bail Report]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 30, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 23, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 23, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.