U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ghost Bear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 21, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 21, 2022: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 07, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • October 07, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 07, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Amended Petition to Revoke]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
  • August 02, 2021: [Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
March, 2021
  • March 29, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2021
  • February 10, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • February 05, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 04, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 03, 2021: [Consent]
  • February 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • February 03, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 03, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 07, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 07, 2018: [Sentencing]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 21, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 21, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • November 20, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 19, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 15, 2018: [Extend]
  • October 03, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 01, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 09, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • August 09, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • August 09, 2018: [Consent]
  • August 07, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • August 07, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 18, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 18, 2018: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 18, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 18, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 03, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 26, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 11, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 11, 2018: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 11, 2018: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • June 06, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 06, 2018: [Request]
  • June 05, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 05, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 05, 2018: [Consent]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 05, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 05, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 05, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 05, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 05, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 05, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 05, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
May, 2018
  • May 30, 2018: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 29, 2018: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 23, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 23, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • May 23, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.