U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Guaderama-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 16, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 16, 2018: [Sentencing]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 30, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 30, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 29, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • August 17, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • August 17, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • August 03, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 06, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 06, 2018: [Consent]
  • July 06, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
June, 2018
  • June 27, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 26, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 26, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • June 26, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • June 26, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 01, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 23, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • May 23, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 23, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.