U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez-Crisostomo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 04, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 04, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 19, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 19, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 25, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 21, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 21, 2018: [Consent]
  • September 21, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 31, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 31, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 31, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2018
  • July 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 06, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 15, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • June 08, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Request]
  • May 31, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 30, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 30, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 30, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 30, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 30, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • May 30, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 30, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 29, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 29, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 29, 2018: [Interpreter Needed]
  • May 29, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 23, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 23, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.