U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Makes Him First
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 07, 2022: [Transcript - Restricted]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Response]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Standing Order 20-06 Information]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Intent Not to Supplement]
  • July 23, 2021: [Relief under FIRST STEP Act (COURT USE ONLY)]
March, 2019
  • March 11, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
  • March 11, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
February, 2019
  • February 26, 2019: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • February 19, 2019: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • February 15, 2019: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • February 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 05, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 05, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
January, 2019
  • January 22, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • January 17, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • January 10, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2019: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 28, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 28, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 28, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • December 28, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
  • December 28, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 27, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • December 21, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
November, 2018
  • November 15, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 07, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 07, 2018: [Consent]
  • September 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2018
  • August 14, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 14, 2018: [Redacted Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 14, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 14, 2018: [Sealed Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 07, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 26, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • June 08, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2018: [Arraignment]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 29, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • May 23, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • May 23, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 23, 2018: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • May 23, 2018: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.