U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cr-50060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Valadez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 30, 2020: [Warrant Returned Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 07, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 07, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 04, 2019: [Sentencing]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 28, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 28, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 28, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 10, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 07, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 07, 2018: [Consent]
  • September 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 04, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 04, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 04, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 20, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • July 11, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • July 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
June, 2018
  • June 20, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 20, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 20, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 15, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 15, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 15, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • June 14, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 14, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2018: [Arrest]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 23, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.