U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:18-cr-30069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Different Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 14, 2019: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • July 01, 2019: [Exhibit List]
  • July 01, 2019: [Sentencing]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 21, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 21, 2019: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2019: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 12, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • May 29, 2019: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 15, 2019: [Furlough]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 03, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 19, 2019: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 19, 2019: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 19, 2019: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 19, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • February 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 17, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • December 17, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 12, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
August, 2018
  • August 24, 2018: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 21, 2018: [Furlough]
  • August 20, 2018: [Furlough]
July, 2018
  • July 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 19, 2018: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Order]
  • June 08, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • June 08, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • June 08, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 08, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • June 08, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 06, 2018: [Request]
  • June 05, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 01, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • May 31, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • May 31, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 31, 2018: [Arrest]
  • May 31, 2018: [Request]
  • May 31, 2018: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 31, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • May 31, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 31, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 23, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • May 23, 2018: [Indictment]
  • May 23, 2018: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.