U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-03001
  • Case Name: Bohr et al v. Pierre Dental
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 13, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Default Judgment]
  • August 29, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment on Pleadings]
  • August 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Judgment on Pleadings]
  • August 16, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 14, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Amended Complaint]
  • July 21, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 19, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Status Letter by Court]
June, 2018
  • June 28, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 26, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • May 25, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • May 24, 2018: ap Office: 3 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.